SB0038 (CH0526)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Motor Vehicle Administration – Birth Certificates – Issuance of Copies

Sponsored by:

Chair, Finance Committee

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 526


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate10/12/201710/12/2017Pre-filed
1/10/20181/10/2018First Reading Finance
1/3/20181/3/2018Hearing 1/17 at 2:00 p.m.
1/10/20181/10/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 1/17 at 1:30 p.m.
1/19/20181/19/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
1/22/20181/22/2018Favorable with Amendments {637173/1 Report Adopted9
Second Reading Passed with Amendments9
1/24/20181/24/2018Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Madaleno) Rejected (7-38)11
Third Reading Passed (44-0)11
House1/25/20181/25/2018First Reading Environment and Transportation12
2/27/20182/27/2018Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
4/2/20184/2/2018Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
4/3/20183/25/2018Favorable Report Adopted59
Special Order until next session (Delegate Lam) Adopted 59
4/4/20183/26/2018Second Reading Passed60
4/7/20183/31/2018Third Reading Passed (137-0)65
Senate4/9/20184/3/2018Returned Passed65
Post Passage5/8/20185/8/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 526

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 8, 2018 1:35 P.M.