SB0046 (CH0333)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Anne Arundel County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone

Sponsored by:

Senator Reilly

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 333


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate10/26/201510/26/2015Pre-filed
1/13/20161/13/2016First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/6/20161/6/2016Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
2/19/20162/19/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/20162/23/2016Favorable with Amendments {554335/129
Committee Amendment Adopted29
Special Order until 2/24 (Senator Astle) Adopted 29
2/24/20162/24/2016Favorable30
Special Order until 2/25 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 30
2/25/20162/25/2016Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted31
Second Reading Passed with Amendments31
2/29/20162/29/2016Third Reading Passed (43-4)33
House3/1/20163/1/2016First Reading Environment and Transportation35
3/22/20163/22/2016Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
4/6/20164/6/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
4/7/20163/31/2016Favorable with Amendments {920511/1 Report Adopted63
Second Reading Passed with Amendments63
4/11/20164/5/2016Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-4)68
Senate4/11/20164/5/2016Senate Concur - House Amendment65
Third Reading Passed (45-0)65
Passed Enrolled65
Post Passage5/10/20165/10/2016Approved by the Governor - Chapter 333

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:07 P.M.