SB0065 (CH0016)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Workers' Compensation - Claim Processing - Electronic Delivery of Decisions

Sponsored by:

Chair, Finance Committee

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 16


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate10/4/201210/4/2012Pre-filed
1/9/20131/9/2013First Reading Finance
1/7/20131/7/2013Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
1/16/20131/16/2013Favorable Report by Finance
1/17/20131/17/2013Favorable Report Adopted7
Second Reading Passed7
1/21/20131/18/2013Third Reading Passed (42-0)8A
House1/22/20131/22/2013First Reading Economic Matters10
2/27/20132/27/2013Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
3/28/20133/28/2013Favorable Report by Economic Matters
3/28/20133/24/2013Favorable Report Adopted57
Second Reading Passed57
4/1/20133/26/2013Third Reading Passed (131-0)59
Senate4/1/20133/27/2013Returned Passed58
Post Passage4/9/20134/9/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 16

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:07 P.M.