SB0071

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public and Nonpublic Schools - Student Diabetes Management Program

Sponsored by:

Senator Young

Status:

In the House - Conference Committee Appointed


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate7/6/20157/6/2015Pre-filed
1/13/20161/13/2016First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/6/20161/6/2016Hearing 1/20 at 3:30 p.m.
1/19/20161/19/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 1/20 at 3:00 p.m.
2/15/20162/15/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/20162/16/2016Favorable with Amendments {204832/1 Report Adopted24
Second Reading Passed with Amendments24
2/18/20162/18/2016Third Reading Passed (37-10)26
House2/19/20162/19/2016First Reading Ways and Means28
3/11/20163/11/2016Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
4/8/20164/8/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/9/20164/3/2016Favorable with Amendments {395262/1 Report Adopted66A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments66A
4/9/20164/4/2016Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-0)67
Senate4/11/20164/5/2016Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments65
Senate Requests House Recede65
Conference Committee Appointed65
Senators Young, Nathan-Pulliam, and Bates65
House4/11/20164/7/2016House Refuses to Recede70
Conference Committee Appointed70
Delegates D. Barnes, Shoemaker, and Patterson70

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:07 P.M.