SB0077 (CH0196)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Anne Arundel County and Harford County - Courthouse Dog and Child Witness Pilot Program

Sponsored by:

Senator Simonaire

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 196


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate10/12/201610/12/2016Pre-filed
1/11/20171/11/2017First Reading Judicial Proceedings
1/4/20171/4/2017Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
2/6/20172/6/2017Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2/8/20172/8/2017Favorable Report Adopted19
Second Reading Passed19
2/13/20172/13/2017Third Reading Passed (46-0)22
House2/14/20172/14/2017First Reading Judiciary25
3/10/20173/10/2017Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
3/31/20173/31/2017Favorable Report by Judiciary
3/31/20173/27/2017Favorable Report Adopted61
Second Reading Passed61
4/4/20173/28/2017Third Reading Passed (139-0)62
Senate4/5/20173/30/2017Returned Passed59
Post Passage4/18/20174/18/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 196

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 18, 2017 12:11 P.M.