SB0083 (CH0529)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public Safety - School Safety Enforcement Fund

Sponsored by:

Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 529


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate9/29/20159/29/2015Pre-filed
1/13/20161/13/2016First Reading Judicial Proceedings
1/6/20161/6/2016Hearing 1/21 at 2:00 p.m.
1/7/20161/7/2016Hearing cancelled
1/13/20161/13/2016Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2/8/20162/8/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2/9/20162/9/2016Favorable with Amendments {658277/1 Report Adopted19
Second Reading Passed with Amendments19
2/11/20162/11/2016Third Reading Passed (47-0)21
House2/12/20162/12/2016First Reading Appropriations23
3/2/20163/2/2016Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20164/5/2016Favorable Report by Appropriations
4/5/20163/29/2016Favorable Report Adopted61
Second Reading Passed61
4/6/20163/30/2016Third Reading Passed (135-0)62
Senate4/7/20164/1/2016Returned Passed61
Post Passage5/19/20165/19/2016Approved by the Governor - Chapter 529

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:07 P.M.