SB0090

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public and Nonpublic Schools - Classwork and Assessment Involving Live and Dead Animals - Student Right of Refusal

Sponsored by:

Senator Young

Status:

In the Senate - Second Reading Failed


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate10/6/201610/6/2016Pre-filed
1/11/20171/11/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/6/20171/6/2017Hearing 1/25 at 2:00 p.m.
1/12/20171/12/2017Hearing canceled
Hearing 1/25 at 3:00 p.m.
2/23/20172/23/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/20172/24/2017Favorable with Amendments {714131/131
Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted31
2/27/20172/27/2017Favorable with Amendments {714131/1 Adopted32
Favorable with Amendments Report Rejected (13-30)32
Second Reading Failed32

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:09 P.M.