SB0096 (CH0023)

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Health Insurance - Conformity With and Implementation of the Federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act

Sponsored by:

Chair, Finance Committee

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 23


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate11/7/201311/7/2013Pre-filed
1/8/20141/8/2014First Reading Finance
1/2/20141/2/2014Hearing 1/15 at 2:00 p.m.
2/10/20142/10/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2/11/20142/11/2014Favorable with Amendments {537177/1 Report Adopted23
Second Reading Passed with Amendments23
2/13/20142/13/2014Third Reading Passed (38-7)25
House2/14/20142/14/2014First Reading Health and Government Operations28
3/5/20143/5/2014Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
3/26/20143/26/2014Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
3/26/20143/21/2014Favorable Report Adopted57
Second Reading Passed57
3/27/20143/22/2014Third Reading Passed (95-41)58
Senate3/28/20143/21/2014Returned Passed55
Post Passage4/8/20144/8/2014Approved by the Governor - Chapter 23

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 8, 2014 12:16 P.M.