SB0124 (CH0294)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

St. Mary's County - Vocational Training Facility - Repeal

Sponsored by:

Senator Waugh

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 294


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/16/20171/16/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/17/20171/17/2017Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
2/6/20172/6/2017Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/20172/7/2017Favorable Report Adopted18
Second Reading Passed18
2/9/20172/9/2017Third Reading Passed (46-0)20
House2/10/20172/10/2017First Reading Environment and Transportation23
3/6/20173/6/2017Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
4/3/20174/3/2017Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
4/3/20173/27/2017Favorable Report Adopted61A
Second Reading Passed61A
4/10/20174/3/2017Third Reading Passed (137-0)68
Senate4/10/20174/4/2017Returned Passed64
Post Passage4/18/20174/18/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 294

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 5, 2017 9:11 A.M.