SB0139 (CH0414)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Higher Education - Heroin and Opioid Addiction and Prevention Policies - Exceptions and Revisions

Sponsored by:

Senator Conway

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 414


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/12/20181/12/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/17/20181/17/2018Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
2/5/20182/5/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/6/20182/6/2018Favorable with Amendments {884535/1 Report Adopted20
Second Reading Passed with Amendments20
2/8/20182/8/2018Third Reading Passed (46-0)22
House2/9/20182/9/2018First Reading Appropriations23
2/28/20182/28/2018Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
3/19/20183/19/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 3/20 at 1:15 p.m.
4/3/20184/3/2018Favorable Report by Appropriations
4/3/20183/25/2018Favorable Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed59
4/4/20183/26/2018Third Reading Passed (137-0)60
Senate4/5/20183/31/2018Returned Passed62
Post Passage5/8/20185/8/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 414

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 8, 2018 1:33 P.M.