SB0140 (CH0049)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

St. Mary's County - Local Plumbing Code - Repeal

Sponsored by:

Senator Waugh

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 49


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/16/20171/16/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/17/20171/17/2017Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
1/30/20171/30/2017Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/20171/31/2017Favorable Report Adopted14
Second Reading Passed14
2/2/20172/2/2017Third Reading Passed (45-0)16
House2/3/20172/3/2017First Reading Economic Matters18
3/27/20173/27/2017Favorable Report by Economic Matters
3/27/20173/22/2017Favorable Report Adopted56
Second Reading Passed56
3/28/20173/23/2017Third Reading Passed (139-0)57
Senate3/29/20173/25/2017Returned Passed54
Post Passage4/11/20174/11/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 49

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 5, 2017 9:11 A.M.