SB0179

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Property Tax Credits - Real Property Used for Robotics Programs

Sponsored by:

Senator Guzzone

Status:

In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/17/20181/17/2018First Reading Budget and Taxation
Hearing 1/30 at 1:30 p.m.
1/31/20181/31/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2/1/20182/1/2018Favorable with Amendments {869635/1 Report Adopted17
Second Reading Passed with Amendments17
2/5/20182/5/2018Third Reading Passed (46-0)19
House2/6/20182/6/2018First Reading Ways and Means20
3/5/20183/5/2018Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 5, 2018 3:26 P.M.