SB0185 (CH0570)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2019)

Sponsored by:

President

Status:

Enacted under Article III, Section 52(6) of the Maryland Constitution Assigned a chapter number - Chapter 570


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/17/20181/17/2018First Reading Budget and Taxation
3/12/20183/12/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Favorable with Amendments44
Laid Over (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted44
3/13/20183/13/2018Favorable with Amendments45
Special Order until 3/14 (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted 45
3/14/20183/14/2018Favorable with Amendments46
Committee Amendment (#1-10) Adopted46
Committee Amendment (#11-25) Adopted46
Committee Amendment (#26-40) Adopted46
Committee Amendment (#41-55) Adopted46
Committee Amendment (#56-64) Adopted46
Committee Amendment (#65-74) Adopted46
Committee Amendment (#75-93) Adopted46
Committee Amendment (#94-101) Adopted46
Committee Amendment (#102-107) Adopted46
Committee Amendment (#108-125) Adopted46
Committee Amendment (#126-136) Adopted46
Committee Amendment (#137-138) Adopted46
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted46
Floor Amendment {303820/1 (Senator Waugh) Rejected (15-30)46
Floor Amendment {873727/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (13-33)46
Second Reading Passed with Amendments46
3/15/20183/15/2018Third Reading Passed (45-0)47
House3/15/20183/12/2018First Reading Appropriations46
3/19/20183/19/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
3/19/20183/15/2018Favorable with Amendments49
Special Order until 3/21 (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted 49
3/21/20183/17/2018Favorable with Amendments51
Committee Amendment (#1-9) Adopted51
Committee Amendment (#10-19) Adopted51
Committee Amendment (#20-27) Adopted51
Committee Amendment (#28-38) Adopted51
Committee Amendment (#39-51) Adopted51
Committee Amendment (#52) Adopted (84-47)51
Committee Amendment (#53-59) Adopted51
Committee Amendment (#60-65) Adopted51
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted51
Second Reading Passed with Amendments51
3/22/20183/18/2018Floor Amendment {633120/1 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted52
Floor Amendment {783823/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (55-80)52
Floor Amendment {843524/1 (Delegate Rose) Rejected (52-80)52
Floor Amendment {893729/1 (Delegate Flanagan) Rejected (48-87)52
Floor Amendment {193822/1 (Delegate Shoemaker) Rejected (48-87)52
Floor Amendment {653326/1 (Delegate Rey) Rejected (52-84)52
Floor Amendment {653827/1 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (50-86)52
Floor Amendment {783828/1 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (50-86)52
Floor Amendment {693329/1 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (49-87)52
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (126-11)52
Senate3/23/20183/21/2018Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments52
Senate Requests House Recede52
Conference Committee Appointed52
Senators Kasemeyer, DeGrange, Madaleno, King, and Edwards52
Senate advisors:52
(Senators McFadden, Ferguson and Serafini)52
House3/23/20183/18/2018House Refuses to Recede52A
Conference Committee Appointed52A
Delegates McIntosh, Gaines, Jones, Reznik, and Beitzel52A
House advisors:52A
(Delegates Haynes and Kaiser)52A
Senate3/27/20183/23/2018Conference Committee Report Adopted54
Third Reading Passed (47-0)54
House3/27/20183/20/2018Conference Committee Report Adopted54
Motion Special Order until 3/28 (Delegate McMillan) Withdrawn54
Special Order until next session (Delegate McMillan) Adopted 54
Third Reading Passed (126-8)54A
Senate3/27/20183/23/2018Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/8/20183/27/2018Enacted under Article III, Section 52(6) of the Maryland Constitution
5/8/20185/8/2018Assigned a chapter number - Chapter 570

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 8, 2018 1:39 P.M.