SB0186 (CH0009)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2018, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2007, 2010, 2011, 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, 2016, and 2017

Sponsored by:

President

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 9


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/17/20181/17/2018First Reading Budget and Taxation
3/19/20183/19/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/19/20183/16/2018Favorable with Amendments48B
Special Order until 3/20 (Senator DeGrange) Adopted 48B
3/20/20183/18/2018Favorable with Amendments49
Committee Amendment (#1) Adopted49
Committee Amendment (#2-10) Adopted49
Committee Amendment (#11-16) Adopted49
Committee Amendment (#17-44) Adopted49
Committee Amendment (#45) Adopted49
Committee Amendment (#46-85) Adopted49
Committee Amendment (#86-94) Adopted49
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted49
Second Reading Passed with Amendments49
3/21/20183/19/2018Third Reading Passed (45-0)50
House3/21/20183/17/2018First Reading Appropriations51
3/23/20183/23/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
3/23/20183/18/2018Favorable with Amendments52A
Special Order until 3/26 (Delegate Jones) Adopted 52A
3/26/20183/19/2018Favorable with Amendments53
Committee Amendment (#1) Adopted53
Committee Amendment (#2-4) Adopted53
Committee Amendment (#5-9) Adopted53
Committee Amendment (#10-43) Adopted53
Committee Amendment (#44-50) Adopted53
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted53
Second Reading Passed with Amendments53
Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Jones) Adopted (127-3)53
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (126-4)53
Senate3/26/20183/22/2018Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments53
Senate Requests House Recede53
Conference Committee Appointed53
Senators DeGrange, Kasemeyer, Peters, McFadden, and Edwards53
Senate advisors:53
(Senators Madaleno, Eckardt and King)53
House3/26/20183/19/2018House Refuses to Recede53
Conference Committee Appointed53
Delegates Jones, McIntosh, Gaines, A. Miller, and Ghrist53
House advisors:53
(Delegates Haynes, McKay and Reznik)53
Senate3/28/20183/24/2018Conference Committee Report Adopted55
Third Reading Passed (45-1)55
House3/28/20183/21/2018Conference Committee Report Adopted55
Third Reading Passed (130-8)55
Senate3/28/20183/24/2018Passed Enrolled
Post Passage4/5/20184/5/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 9

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 5, 2018 10:56 A.M.