SB0190 (CH0003)

Find a 2015 Bill:

2015 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Sales and Use Tax - Taxable Price - Accommodations

Sponsored by:

Senator Madaleno

Status:

Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 3 of 2016


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/2/20152/2/2015First Reading Budget and Taxation
2/4/20152/4/2015Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
3/19/20153/19/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Favorable with Amendments {509532/146
Committee Amendment Adopted46
Special Order until 3/20 (Senator Hough) Adopted 46
3/20/20153/20/2015Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted47
Floor Amendment (Senator Serafini) {963526/147
Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted47
3/23/20153/20/2015Floor Amendment (Senator Serafini) {963526/1 Rejected (15-29)47A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47A
3/24/20153/21/2015Third Reading Passed (32-15)48
House3/25/20153/23/2015First Reading Ways and Means53
3/25/20153/25/2015Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
4/3/20154/3/2015Favorable Report by Ways and Means
4/3/20153/30/2015Favorable Report Adopted60
Special Order until 4/6 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 60
4/7/20154/1/2015Second Reading Passed62
4/8/20154/2/2015Third Reading Passed (84-56)63
Senate4/9/20154/2/2015Returned Passed60
Post Passage5/22/20155/22/2015Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Senate1/13/20161/13/2016Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
1/21/20161/21/2016Veto overridden (30-16)
House1/21/20161/21/2016Veto overridden (89-52)
Post Passage1/21/20161/21/2016Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 3 of 2016

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


February 16, 2016 8:24 A.M.