SB0199 (CH0205)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Real Property - Refinance Mortgage - Priority over Junior Liens

Sponsored by:

Senator Frosh

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 205


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/18/20131/18/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
3/5/20133/5/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/6/20133/6/2013Favorable with Amendments {638972/1 Report Adopted39
Second Reading Passed with Amendments39
3/8/20133/8/2013Third Reading Passed (45-0)41
House3/8/20133/8/2013First Reading Environmental Matters43
3/25/20133/25/2013Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
4/6/20134/6/2013Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
4/6/20134/1/2013Favorable Report Adopted65
Second Reading Passed65
4/8/20134/2/2013Third Reading Passed (136-0)66
Senate4/8/20134/4/2013Returned Passed66
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 205

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:07 P.M.