SB0199

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Transit and Transportation Service - Audio Recordings - Requirements and Limitations

Sponsored by:

Senator Brochin

Status:

In the House - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/20/20161/20/2016First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
1/22/20161/22/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2/22/20162/22/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2/23/20162/23/2016Favorable with Amendments {908774/129
Motion Laid Over (Senator Ferguson) Adopted29
2/24/20162/24/2016Favorable with Amendments {908774/130
Special Order until 2/25 (Senator Benson) Adopted 30
2/25/20162/25/2016Favorable with Amendments {908774/131
Special Order until 3/1 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 31
3/1/20163/1/2016Favorable with Amendments {908774/134
Special Order until 3/2 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 34
3/2/20163/2/2016Favorable with Amendments {908774/135
Motion Withdrawn Committee Amendment (Senator Zirkin) Adopted35
Substitute Committee Amendment {518478/1 Adopted35
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted35
Second Reading Passed with Amendments35
3/4/20163/4/2016Third Reading Passed (44-0)37
House3/4/20163/4/2016First Reading Environment and Transportation38
3/8/20163/8/2016Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:08 P.M.