SB0230 (CH0209)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Open Meetings Act - Public Body - Definition

Sponsored by:

Senator Getty

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 209


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/21/20131/18/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/20131/23/2013Hearing 2/07 at 1:45 p.m.
2/14/20132/14/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/20132/15/2013Favorable with Amendments {334833/1 Report Adopted26
Second Reading Passed with Amendments26
2/19/20132/19/2013Third Reading Passed (46-0)28
House2/20/20132/20/2013First Reading Health and Government Operations31
3/13/20133/13/2013Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20134/5/2013Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
4/6/20134/1/2013Favorable Report Adopted65
Second Reading Passed65
4/8/20134/3/2013Third Reading Passed (140-0)67
Senate4/8/20134/5/2013Returned Passed67
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 209

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:07 P.M.