SB0239 (CH0034)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Judgeships - Court of Special Appeals, Circuit Courts, and District Court

Sponsored by:

President

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 34


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/21/20131/18/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation
1/23/20131/23/2013Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
3/11/20133/11/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/12/20133/12/2013Favorable Report Adopted43
Second Reading Passed43
3/14/20133/14/2013Third Reading Passed (45-0)45
House3/14/20133/14/2013First Reading Judiciary47
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
4/3/20134/3/2013Favorable Report by Judiciary
4/3/20133/28/2013Favorable Report Adopted61
Second Reading Passed61
4/4/20133/30/2013Third Reading Passed (132-5)63
Senate4/5/20133/31/2013Returned Passed62
Post Passage4/9/20134/9/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 34

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:07 P.M.