SB0265 (CH0037)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Children in Need of Assistance - Rights of Preadoptive Parents, Foster Parents, and Caregivers of Child

Sponsored by:

Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 37


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/18/20131/18/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings
1/23/20131/23/2013Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
3/12/20133/12/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/13/20133/13/2013Favorable Report Adopted44
Second Reading Passed44
3/15/20133/15/2013Third Reading Passed (41-0)46
House3/18/20133/15/2013First Reading Judiciary48A
3/19/20133/19/2013Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/29/20133/29/2013Favorable Report by Judiciary
3/29/20133/25/2013Favorable Report Adopted58
Second Reading Passed58
4/2/20133/27/2013Third Reading Passed (139-1)60
Senate4/3/20133/29/2013Returned Passed60
Post Passage4/9/20134/9/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 37

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:08 P.M.