SB0267 (CH0038)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Interception of Communications - Abuse or Neglect of Vulnerable Adult and Medicaid Fraud

Sponsored by:

Senator Raskin

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 38


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/18/20131/18/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings
1/23/20131/23/2013Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
3/5/20133/5/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/6/20133/6/2013Favorable Report Adopted39
Second Reading Passed39
3/8/20133/8/2013Third Reading Passed (46-0)41
House3/8/20133/8/2013First Reading Judiciary43
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
3/29/20133/29/2013Favorable Report by Judiciary
3/29/20133/25/2013Favorable Report Adopted58
Second Reading Passed58
4/2/20133/27/2013Third Reading Passed (140-0)60
Senate4/3/20133/29/2013Returned Passed60
Post Passage4/9/20134/9/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 38

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:08 P.M.