SB0273 (CH0154)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Veterans Full Employment Act of 2013

Sponsored by:

President

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 154


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/18/20131/18/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/20131/23/2013Hearing 2/07 at 1:45 p.m.
3/20/20133/20/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/20133/18/2013Favorable with Amendments {414137/1 Report Adopted49
Second Reading Passed with Amendments49
3/22/20133/20/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)51
House3/22/20133/19/2013First Reading Health and Government Operations and Economic Matters52
3/27/20133/27/2013Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
4/5/20134/5/2013Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
4/6/20134/1/2013Favorable Report Adopted65
Second Reading Passed65
4/8/20134/3/2013Third Reading Passed (140-0)67
Senate4/8/20134/5/2013Returned Passed67
Post Passage4/17/20134/17/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 154

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:08 P.M.