SB0278

Find a 2015 Bill:

2015 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public Schools - Health and Safety - Food Transparency

Sponsored by:

Senator Nathan-Pulliam

Status:

In the Senate - Second Reading Failed


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/4/20152/4/2015First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
3/16/20153/16/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/20153/17/2015Favorable with Amendments {204136/144
Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted44
3/19/20153/19/2015Favorable with Amendments {204136/146
Special Order until 3/20 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 46
3/20/20153/20/2015Favorable with Amendments {204136/147
Committee Amendment Adopted47
Favorable with Amendments Report Rejected (21-24)47
Second Reading Failed47

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:47 P.M.