SB0279 (CH0157)

2013 Regular Session



Election Law - Improving Access to Voting

Sponsored by:



Approved by the Governor - Chapter 157

ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/18/20131/18/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/30/20131/30/2013Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/4/20133/4/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/5/20133/5/2013Favorable with Amendments {184239/138
Special Order until 3/7 (Senator Dyson) Adopted 38
3/7/20133/7/2013Favorable with Amendments {184239/140
Committee Amendment Adopted40
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted (38-7)40
Floor Committee Amendment (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) {664735/1 Adopted40
Floor Amendment (Senator Kittleman) {653921/2 Rejected (18-29)40
Floor Amendment (Senator Edwards) {743926/1 Adopted40
Second Reading Passed with Amendments40
3/11/20133/11/2013Third Reading Passed (35-12)42
House3/12/20133/12/2013First Reading Ways and Means45
3/20/20133/20/2013Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
4/3/20134/3/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/3/20133/28/2013Favorable with Amendments {965060/1 Report Adopted61
Second Reading Passed with Amendments61
4/4/20133/29/2013Third Reading Passed with Amendments (101-37)62
Senate4/5/20134/1/2013Special Order until 4/8 (Senator Kittleman) Adopted 63
4/8/20134/2/2013Senate Concur - House Amendments64
Third Reading Passed (38-9)64
Passed Enrolled64
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 157

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions

October 24, 2017 1:08 P.M.