SB0285

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Health Occupations - Kinesiotherapy - Study

Sponsored by:

Senator Peters

Status:

In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/23/20131/23/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/30/20131/30/2013Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
3/4/20133/4/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/5/20133/5/2013Favorable with Amendments {184531/1 Report Adopted38
Second Reading Passed with Amendments38
3/7/20133/7/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)40
House3/8/20133/8/2013First Reading Health and Government Operations43
3/13/20133/13/2013Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
3/22/20133/22/2013Hearing cancelled
3/28/20133/28/2013Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:08 P.M.