SB0299

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Golden Beach Patuxent Knolls

Sponsored by:

Senator Waugh

Status:

Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/20/20171/20/2017First Reading Judicial Proceedings
1/25/20171/25/2017Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2/13/20172/13/2017Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2/14/20172/14/2017Favorable Report Adopted23
Second Reading Passed23
2/16/20172/16/2017Third Reading Passed (46-0)25
House2/17/20172/17/2017First Reading Environment and Transportation28
3/6/20173/6/2017Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
4/6/20174/6/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
4/6/20173/30/2017Favorable with Amendments {360715/1 Report Adopted64
Second Reading Passed with Amendments64
4/8/20174/1/2017Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0)66
Senate4/10/20174/3/2017Senate Concur - House Amendments63A
Third Reading Passed (35-0)63A
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/26/20175/26/2017Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 30, 2017 1:01 P.M.