SB0307 (CH0030)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act - Application and Evaluation

Sponsored by:

President

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 30


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/20/20171/20/2017First Reading Budget and Taxation
2/1/20172/1/2017Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
3/13/20173/13/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/14/20173/14/2017Favorable with Amendments {849036/143
Laid Over (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted43
3/15/20173/15/2017Favorable with Amendments {849036/1 Report Adopted44
Floor Amendment {983727/1 (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted44
Floor Amendment {713728/1 (Senator Serafini) Adopted44
Second Reading Passed with Amendments44
3/16/20173/16/2017Third Reading Passed (47-0)45
House3/17/20173/14/2017First Reading Appropriations and Environment and Transportation48
3/22/20173/22/2017Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
4/6/20174/6/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
4/6/20173/30/2017Favorable with Amendments {584664/1 Report Adopted64
Second Reading Passed with Amendments64
4/7/20173/31/2017Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0)65
Senate4/10/20174/2/2017Senate Concur - House Amendments62
Third Reading Passed (46-0)62
Passed Enrolled62
Post Passage4/11/20174/11/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 30

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 11, 2017 2:00 P.M.