SB0308 (CH0151)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Child Abuse - Sex Trafficking (Protecting Victims of Sex Trafficking Act of 2017)

Sponsored by:

President

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 151


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/20/20171/20/2017First Reading Judicial Proceedings
1/25/20171/25/2017Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
2/27/20172/27/2017Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/1/20173/1/2017Favorable Report Adopted34
Floor Amendment {673920/1 (Senator Muse) Adopted34
Second Reading Passed with Amendments34
3/3/20173/3/2017Third Reading Passed (46-0)36
House3/6/20173/6/2017First Reading Judiciary39
3/8/20173/8/2017Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
3/31/20173/31/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/31/20173/27/2017Favorable with Amendments {512614/1 Report Adopted61
Second Reading Passed with Amendments61
4/4/20173/28/2017Third Reading Passed with Amendments (140-0)62
Senate4/5/20173/30/2017Senate Concur - House Amendments59
Third Reading Passed (47-0)59
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage4/18/20174/18/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 151

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 5, 2017 9:11 A.M.