SB0310

Find a 2015 Bill:

2015 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Maryland Seal of Biliteracy Act - Establishment

Sponsored by:

Senator Rosapepe

Status:

In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/5/20152/5/2015First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
3/2/20153/2/2015Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/20153/3/2015Favorable Report Adopted34
Second Reading Passed34
3/5/20153/5/2015Third Reading Passed (46-0)36
House3/6/20153/6/2015First Reading Ways and Means38
3/10/20153/10/2015Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
3/17/20153/17/2015Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:48 P.M.