SB0313 (CH0365)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Economic Development - Maryland Energy Innovation Institute

Sponsored by:

President

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 365


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/20/20171/20/2017First Reading Finance
1/26/20171/26/2017Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
3/9/20173/9/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
3/13/20173/13/2017Favorable with Amendments {667879/1 Report Adopted42
Second Reading Passed with Amendments42
3/15/20173/15/2017Third Reading Passed (47-0)44
House3/15/20173/12/2017First Reading Economic Matters and Appropriations46
3/27/20173/27/2017Favorable Report by Economic Matters
3/27/20173/22/2017Favorable Report Adopted56
Second Reading Passed56
3/28/20173/23/2017Third Reading Passed (122-18)57
Senate3/29/20173/25/2017Returned Passed54
Post Passage5/4/20175/4/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 365

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:10 P.M.