SB0318

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Income Tax – Standard Deduction – Alteration and Cost–of–Living Adjustments

Sponsored by:

Senator Kasemeyer

Status:

In the Senate - Passed Enrolled


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/24/20181/24/2018First Reading Budget and Taxation
1/31/20181/31/2018Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/7/20183/7/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/8/20183/8/2018Favorable with Amendments {499136/142
Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted42
3/9/20183/9/2018Favorable with Amendments {499136/143
Special Order until 3/12 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 43
3/12/20183/12/2018Favorable with Amendments {499136/1 Report Adopted44
Floor Amendment {433827/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (13-32)44
Floor Amendment {583924/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (13-32)44
Floor Amendment {363925/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (14-31)44
Floor Amendment {283527/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected (14-31)44
Second Reading Passed with Amendments44
3/14/20183/14/2018Third Reading Passed (46-0)46
House3/14/20183/11/2018First Reading Ways and Means45
3/16/20183/16/2018Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20184/5/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/5/20183/27/2018Favorable with Amendments {155465/1 Report Adopted61A
Floor Amendment {523126/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (52-84)61A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments61A
4/6/20183/28/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0)62
Senate4/9/20184/2/2018Senate Concur - House Amendments64
Third Reading Passed (45-0)64
Passed Enrolled

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 9, 2018 10:57 A.M.