SB0319 (CH0591)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Pathways in Technology Early College High (P-TECH) School Act of 2017

Sponsored by:

President

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 591


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/20/20171/20/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
1/26/20171/26/2017Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
2/23/20172/23/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/20172/24/2017Favorable with Amendments {434033/1 Report Adopted31
Second Reading Passed with Amendments31
2/28/20172/28/2017Third Reading Passed (47-0)33
House3/1/20173/1/2017First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations36
3/8/20173/8/2017Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
4/7/20174/7/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/7/20173/31/2017Favorable with Amendments {735563/1 Report Adopted65
Second Reading Passed with Amendments65
4/8/20174/1/2017Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)66
Senate4/10/20174/2/2017Senate Concur - House Amendments62
Third Reading Passed (47-0)62
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/25/20175/25/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 591

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 25, 2017 12:51 P.M.