SB0321 (CH0291)

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Estates and Trusts - Personal Representatives and Guardians - Standards

Sponsored by:

Senator Getty

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 291


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/17/20141/17/2014First Reading Judicial Proceedings
1/21/20141/21/2014Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2/24/20142/24/2014Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2/25/20142/25/2014Favorable Report Adopted33
Second Reading Passed33
2/27/20142/27/2014Third Reading Passed (46-0)35
House2/28/20142/28/2014First Reading Judiciary38
3/5/20143/5/2014Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
3/31/20143/31/2014Favorable Report by Judiciary
4/1/20143/25/2014Favorable Report Adopted61
Second Reading Passed61
4/2/20143/26/2014Third Reading Passed (131-0)62
Senate4/3/20143/25/2014Returned Passed59
Post Passage5/5/20145/5/2014Approved by the Governor - Chapter 291

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 5, 2014 2:25 P.M.