SB0327

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Elections for Judges of the Orphans' Courts - Nonpartisan Elections

Sponsored by:

Senator Gladden

Status:

In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Dyson)


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/23/20131/23/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/30/20131/30/2013Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
3/7/20133/7/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/20133/11/2013Favorable with Amendments {424731/142
Laid Over (Senator Pipkin) Adopted42
3/12/20133/12/2013Favorable with Amendments {424731/143
Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Dyson)43

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 18, 2013 4:07 P.M.