SB0340

Find a 2015 Bill:

2015 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Election Law - Voting Rights - Ex-Felons

Sponsored by:

Senator Conway

Status:

Vote on Veto Special Ordered until 4/8/2016


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/6/20152/6/2015First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
3/4/20153/4/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/5/20153/5/2015Favorable with Amendments {854039/136
Special Order until 3/6 (Senator Conway) Adopted 36
3/6/20153/6/2015Favorable with Amendments {854039/137
Committee Amendment Withdrawn37
Floor Amendment (Senator Conway) {483321/137
Laid Over (Senator Cassilly) Adopted37
3/9/20153/9/2015Substitute Floor Amendment (Senator Conway) {483321/138
Special Order until 3/12 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 38
3/12/20153/12/2015Substitute Committee Amendment {483321/1 Withdrawn41
Substitute Committee Amendment {634436/1 Adopted41
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted (31-16)41
Floor Amendment (Senator Hershey) {603922/1 Rejected (19-28)41
Floor Amendment (Senator Ready) {853821/1 Rejected (19-28)41
Second Reading Passed with Amendments41
3/16/20153/16/2015Third Reading Passed (29-18)43
House3/17/20153/14/2015First Reading Ways and Means44
3/18/20153/18/2015Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
4/6/20154/6/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/6/20153/31/2015Favorable with Amendments {775663/1 Report Adopted61
Special Order until 4/7 (Delegate Turner) Adopted 61
4/7/20154/1/2015Second Reading Passed with Amendments62
4/8/20154/2/2015Motion Special Order until later today (Delegate B. Wilson) Rejected (60-75)63
Floor Amendment (Delegate B. Wilson) {543929/2 Rejected (58-81)63
Floor Amendment (Delegate Vogt) {313825/1 Rejected (52-84)63
Floor Amendment (Delegate Vogt) {903223/1 Rejected (54-81)63
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (82-56)63
Senate4/9/20154/2/2015Senate Concur - House Amendments (29-18)60
Third Reading Passed (29-18)60
Passed Enrolled60
Post Passage5/22/20155/22/2015Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Senate1/13/20161/13/2016Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/21/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
1/21/20161/21/2016Motion Special Order vote on veto until 2/5/2016 (Senator Conway) Adopted
2/5/20162/5/2016Motion Special Order vote on veto until 2/9/2016 (Senator Conway) Adopted
2/9/20162/9/2016Veto overridden (29-18)
House2/10/20162/10/2016Motion Special Order vote on veto until 3/1/2016 (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted
3/1/20163/1/2016Motion Special Order vote on veto until 3/31/2016 (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted
3/31/20163/26/2016Motion Special Order vote on veto until 4/8/2016 (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 31, 2016 2:46 P.M.