SB0360 (CH0044)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Law - Aggravated Animal Cruelty - Baiting

Sponsored by:

Senator Simonaire

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 44


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/25/20131/25/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings
2/6/20132/6/2013Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
3/18/20133/18/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/19/20133/17/2013Favorable Report Adopted48
Second Reading Passed48
3/21/20133/19/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)50
House3/21/20133/18/2013First Reading Judiciary51
3/22/20133/22/2013Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
3/28/20133/28/2013Favorable Report by Judiciary
3/28/20133/24/2013Favorable Report Adopted57
Second Reading Passed57
4/1/20133/26/2013Third Reading Passed (133-0)59
Senate4/1/20133/27/2013Returned Passed58
Post Passage4/9/20134/9/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 44

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:08 P.M.