SB0369 (CH0067)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Prekindergarten Programs - Notification of Eligibility by Local Departments of Social Services

Sponsored by:

Senator Ferguson

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 67


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/28/20161/28/2016First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
2/29/20162/29/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/20163/1/2016Favorable with Amendments {184034/1 Report Adopted34
Second Reading Passed with Amendments34
3/3/20163/3/2016Third Reading Passed (47-0)36
House3/4/20163/4/2016First Reading Ways and Means38
3/11/20163/11/2016Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
4/4/20164/4/2016Favorable Report by Ways and Means
4/4/20163/28/2016Favorable Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed60
4/5/20163/29/2016Third Reading Passed (135-0)61
Senate4/6/20163/31/2016Returned Passed60
Post Passage4/12/20164/12/2016Approved by the Governor - Chapter 67

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:08 P.M.