SB0376 (CH0144)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Pathways in Technology Early College High (P-TECH) Schools Act of 2016

Sponsored by:

President

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 144


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/28/20161/28/2016First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Motion Rules Suspended Rule 32 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted12
2/10/20162/10/2016Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
4/7/20164/7/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/7/20164/1/2016Favorable with Amendments {754732/2 Report Adopted61A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments61A
4/8/20164/2/2016Third Reading Passed (43-1)62
House4/8/20164/2/2016First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations65
4/8/20164/8/2016Rereferred to Ways and Means and Appropriations
Hearing 4/09 at 9:30 a.m.
4/9/20164/9/2016Favorable Report by Ways and Means
4/9/20164/4/2016Favorable Report Adopted67
Second Reading Passed67
Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted (134-0)67
Third Reading Passed (133-1)67
Senate4/11/20164/3/2016Returned Passed63A
Post Passage4/26/20164/26/2016Approved by the Governor - Chapter 144

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:09 P.M.