SB0393

Find a 2015 Bill:

2015 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Payment of Costs

Sponsored by:

Senator Raskin

Status:

In the House - Conference Committee Appointed


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/6/20152/6/2015First Reading Judicial Proceedings
2/10/20152/10/2015Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
3/13/20153/13/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/16/20153/16/2015Favorable with Amendments {878979/1 Report Adopted43
Second Reading Passed with Amendments43
3/18/20153/18/2015Third Reading Passed (46-0)45
House3/18/20153/15/2015First Reading Judiciary45A
3/19/20153/19/2015Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
4/3/20154/3/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
4/8/20154/2/2015Favorable with Amendments {992815/1 Report Adopted63
Second Reading Passed with Amendments63
4/10/20154/4/2015Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)65
Senate4/13/20154/6/2015Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments64
Senate Requests House Recede64
Conference Committee Appointed64
Senators Ramirez, Ready, and Gladden64
House4/13/20154/9/2015House Refuses to Recede70
Conference Committee Appointed70
Delegates Vallario, Rosenberg, and Anderson70

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:48 P.M.