SB0395 (CH0297)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

St. Mary's County - Metropolitan Commission - Personnel

Sponsored by:

Senator Waugh

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 297


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/27/20171/27/2017First Reading Finance
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
2/20/20172/20/2017Favorable Report by Finance
Favorable Report Adopted27
Second Reading Passed27
2/22/20172/22/2017Third Reading Passed (47-0)29
House2/23/20172/23/2017First Reading Environment and Transportation32
3/28/20173/28/2017Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
4/7/20174/7/2017Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
4/7/20173/31/2017Favorable Report Adopted65
Second Reading Passed65
4/8/20174/1/2017Third Reading Passed (138-0)66
Senate4/10/20174/2/2017Returned Passed62
Post Passage4/18/20174/18/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 297

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 5, 2017 9:12 A.M.