SB0404 (CH0257)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Enhanced Agricultural Management Equipment

Sponsored by:

Senator Middleton

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 257


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/28/20131/28/2013First Reading Budget and Taxation
1/30/20131/30/2013Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2/20/20132/20/2013Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Favorable Report Adopted29
Second Reading Passed29
2/25/20132/25/2013Third Reading Passed (46-0)32
House2/26/20132/26/2013First Reading Ways and Means35
3/15/20133/15/2013Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
3/28/20133/28/2013Favorable Report by Ways and Means
3/28/20133/24/2013Favorable Report Adopted57
Second Reading Passed57
4/2/20133/27/2013Third Reading Passed (140-0)60
Senate4/3/20133/29/2013Returned Passed60
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 257

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:08 P.M.