SB0409

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Health - Food Allergy Awareness

Sponsored by:

Senator Raskin

Status:

In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/23/20141/23/2014First Reading Finance
1/24/20141/24/2014Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Hearing cancelled
1/29/20141/29/2014Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
3/12/20143/12/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
3/13/20143/10/2014Favorable with Amendments {207973/1 Report Adopted44
Second Reading Passed with Amendments44
3/17/20143/12/2014Third Reading Passed (33-14)46
House3/18/20143/15/2014First Reading Health and Government Operations51
3/19/20143/19/2014Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
4/7/20144/7/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
4/7/20144/1/2014Favorable with Amendments {246388/1 Report Adopted68
Second Reading Passed with Amendments68
4/7/20144/2/2014Third Reading Passed with Amendments (99-36)69
Senate4/7/20143/31/2014Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments65
Senate Requests House Recede65
Conference Committee Appointed65
Senators Feldman, Glassman, and Pugh65

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 7, 2014 10:00 P.M.