SB0409 (CH0480)

Find a 2015 Bill:

2015 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing - Regulations

Sponsored by:

Senator Montgomery

Status:

Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 480


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/6/20152/6/2015First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/20152/11/2015Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
4/2/20154/2/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/20153/28/2015Favorable with Amendments {514236/155
Laid Over (Senator Conway) Adopted55
4/3/20153/29/2015Favorable with Amendments {514236/1 Report Adopted56
Floor Amendment (Senator Conway) {973125/1 Adopted56
Second Reading Passed with Amendments56
4/6/20153/30/2015Third Reading Passed (45-2)57
House4/7/20154/1/2015First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations62
4/10/20154/10/2015Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
4/11/20154/11/2015Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
4/11/20154/6/2015Favorable Report Adopted67
Second Reading Passed67
4/13/20154/7/2015Third Reading Passed (103-36)68
Senate4/13/20154/6/2015Returned Passed64
Post Passage5/30/20155/30/2015Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 480

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 20, 2015 7:24 P.M.