SB0422

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Keep Antibiotics Effective Act of 2017

Sponsored by:

Senator Pinsky

Status:

In the Senate - Passed Enrolled


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/27/20171/27/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
3/16/20173/16/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Favorable with Amendments {124736/145
Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted45
3/17/20173/17/2017Favorable with Amendments {124736/1 Report Adopted46
Floor Amendment {163426/1 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted46
Second Reading Passed with Amendments46
3/20/20173/18/2017Third Reading Passed (35-12)47
House3/21/20173/18/2017First Reading Environment and Transportation52
3/21/20173/21/2017Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
4/7/20174/7/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
4/7/20173/31/2017Favorable with Amendments {540414/1 Report Adopted65
Second Reading Passed with Amendments65
4/8/20174/1/2017Third Reading Passed with Amendments (132-6)66
Senate4/10/20174/2/2017Senate Concur - House Amendments62
Third Reading Passed (35-12)62
Passed Enrolled

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 5, 2017 9:12 A.M.