SB0441 (CH0055)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Correctional Training Commission - Members

Sponsored by:

Senator Gladden

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 55


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/30/20131/30/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings
2/6/20132/6/2013Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
3/11/20133/11/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/12/20133/12/2013Favorable with Amendments {158471/1 Report Adopted43
Second Reading Passed with Amendments43
3/14/20133/14/2013Third Reading Passed (46-0)45
House3/14/20133/14/2013First Reading Judiciary47
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
3/28/20133/28/2013Favorable Report by Judiciary
3/28/20133/24/2013Favorable Report Adopted57
Second Reading Passed57
4/1/20133/26/2013Third Reading Passed (132-1)59
Senate4/1/20133/27/2013Returned Passed58
Post Passage4/9/20134/9/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 55

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:08 P.M.