SB0489 (CH0485)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Estates and Trusts - Slayer's Statute (Ann Sue Metz Law)

Sponsored by:

Senator Shank

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 485


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/31/20131/31/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings
2/6/20132/6/2013Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2/27/20132/27/2013Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
3/18/20133/18/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/20/20133/18/2013Favorable Report Adopted49
Second Reading Passed49
3/22/20133/20/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)51
House3/22/20133/19/2013First Reading Judiciary52
3/23/20133/23/2013Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
4/3/20134/3/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
4/3/20133/28/2013Favorable with Amendments {692516/1 Report Adopted61
Second Reading Passed with Amendments61
4/4/20133/30/2013Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)63
Senate4/5/20134/1/2013Senate Concur - House Amendments63
Third Reading Passed (44-0)63
Passed Enrolled63
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 485

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:09 P.M.