SB0490

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Domestic Violence - Persons Eligible for Relief

Sponsored by:

Senator Shank

Status:

In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/31/20131/31/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings
2/6/20132/6/2013Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
3/18/20133/18/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/19/20133/17/2013Favorable with Amendments {198873/1 Report Adopted48
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48
3/21/20133/19/2013Third Reading Passed (45-2)50
House3/21/20133/18/2013First Reading Judiciary51
3/23/20133/23/2013Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:09 P.M.