SB0496 (CH0705)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Environment – Graywater – Residential Use

Sponsored by:

Senator Ready

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 705


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/29/20181/29/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2/26/20182/26/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/20182/27/2018Favorable with Amendments {534837/1 Report Adopted35
Second Reading Passed with Amendments35
3/1/20183/1/2018Special Order until 3/5 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 37
3/5/20183/5/2018Third Reading Passed (45-0)39
House3/6/20183/6/2018First Reading Environment and Transportation40
3/19/20183/19/2018Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
4/2/20184/2/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
4/3/20183/25/2018Favorable with Amendments {820817/1 Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed with Amendments59
4/6/20183/28/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-0)62
Senate4/9/20184/2/2018Senate Concur - House Amendments64
Third Reading Passed (41-0)64
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/15/20185/15/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 705

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 15, 2018 1:17 P.M.