SB0508 (CH0180)

Find a 2015 Bill:

2015 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Children - Child Care Facilities, Public Schools, and Nonpublic Schools - Contractors and Subcontractors

Sponsored by:

Senator Hough

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 180


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/6/20152/6/2015First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/20152/11/2015Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
3/16/20153/16/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/20153/17/2015Favorable with Amendments {814233/1 Report Adopted44
Second Reading Passed with Amendments44
3/18/20153/18/2015Third Reading Passed (46-0)45
House3/18/20153/15/2015First Reading Ways and Means45A
3/19/20153/19/2015Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
4/2/20154/2/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/2/20153/29/2015Favorable with Amendments {125366/1 Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed with Amendments59
4/3/20153/30/2015Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0)60
Senate4/8/20154/1/2015Senate Concur - House Amendments59
Third Reading Passed (47-0)59
Passed Enrolled59
Post Passage5/12/20155/12/2015Approved by the Governor - Chapter 180

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:48 P.M.