SB0515

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Career and Technology Education and Workforce Investment Act

Sponsored by:

Senator Currie

Status:

In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:15 p.m. (Appropriations)


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/29/20181/29/2018First Reading Budget and Taxation
1/31/20181/31/2018Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/5/20183/5/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/6/20183/6/2018Favorable with Amendments {699338/1 Report Adopted40
Floor Amendment {903824/1 (Senator Middleton) Adopted40
Second Reading Passed with Amendments40
3/8/20183/8/2018Third Reading Passed (46-0)42
House3/9/20183/9/2018First Reading Appropriations and Ways and Means43
3/14/20183/14/2018Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
3/19/20183/19/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 3/20 at 1:15 p.m. (Appropriations)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 19, 2018 1:34 P.M.